Global Patent Index - EP 0834359 A3

EP 0834359 A3 2000-07-26 - Driving device for the ram of a forming press

Title (en)

Driving device for the ram of a forming press

Title (de)

Antriebsvorrichtung für einen Pressenstössel einer Umformpresse

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement pour le coulisseau d'une presse de formage

Publication

EP 0834359 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97116876 A

Priority

DE 19640439 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19640439C1] The drive movement of the press ram (7) is derived without a crank shaft directly from an eccentric body (5) in the form of an eccentric disc connected to the planetary wheel gear (1-4). A gear element (3,4) of the planetary wheel gear is connected to the eccentric body which supports at least one coupling element (6) for driving the press ram. The eccentric disc is connected to the planetary wheel support (4) or an annular wheel (3) of the planetary wheel gear which has an extra drive (11,12) for varying the speed of the press ram.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 9/18; B30B 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 9/18 (2006.01); B30B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 1/266 (2013.01); B21J 9/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19640439 C1 19980108; EP 0834359 A2 19980408; EP 0834359 A3 20000726

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 30B 1/26 A

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021014

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21J 9/18 A, 7B 30B 1/26 B

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT