Global patent index - EP 0834367 B1

EP 0834367 B1 2001-01-24 - Float for converter closure

Title (en)

Float for converter closure

Title (de)

Konverterverschlussschwimmer

Title (fr)

Flotteur pour fermeture de convertisseur

Publication

EP 0834367 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97114505 A

Priority

DE 29617115 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834367A1] The float assembly, to retain slag in a converter, has a spring disc (2) incorporated into the float body (1). After assembly, it covers the guide rod (3,4) in a bond with it which does not break under operating conditions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 43/00; C21C 5/46; F27D 3/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/46 (2006.01); F27D 3/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/4653 (2013.01); F27D 3/1536 (2013.01); F27D 3/159 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29617115 U1 19961114; AT 198848 T 20010215; EP 0834367 A1 19980408; EP 0834367 B1 20010124

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BECK U. KALTHEUNER FEUERFESTE ERZEUGNISSE G.M.B.H

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20120831

2011-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-08-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-05-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010424

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702948

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-01

2001-02-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

2001-01-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 198848

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980924

1998-12-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE DK FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

1998-12-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980924

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980218

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

1998-04-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI