Global Patent Index - EP 0834398 B1

EP 0834398 B1 2000-05-10 - Drive for a sheet-fed offset press

Title (en)

Drive for a sheet-fed offset press

Title (de)

Antrieb für eine Bogendruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Eintraînement pour une presse offset à feuilles

Publication

EP 0834398 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115576 A

Priority

DE 19640649 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834398A1] The printing machine drive has at least one drive motor (M) and a common drive train for operation of individual cylinders and/or drums (Z,G,T,G.1-G.4) and plate cylinders (P.1-P.4) for successive printing stages. Switched couplings (K.1-K.4) are inserted in the drive train between the individual plate cylinders, which have respective drive motors (R.1-R.4) for operation of the plate cylinders when the couplings are disengaged.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/008; B41F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/008 (2006.01); B41F 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/0008 (2013.01); B41F 13/008 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 4223583 A1 19940120 - HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0834398 A1 19980408; EP 0834398 B1 20000510; DE 19640649 A1 19980416; JP 3048980 B2 20000605; JP H10114047 A 19980506; US 5983793 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150917

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-05-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130411 AND 20130417

2013-05-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20130403

2012-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 59701632

- Effective date: 20120510

2009-04-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-09-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-08-03 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030910

2002-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020816

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701632 20000615

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-03-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981203

1998-12-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1998-12-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980211

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1998-04-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI