Global Patent Index - EP 0834454 B1

EP 0834454 B1 2000-02-09 - Bags with plastic fasteners and method of manufacturing the same

Title (en)

Bags with plastic fasteners and method of manufacturing the same

Title (de)

Beutel mit Verschluss aus Kunststoff und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Sacs avec fermeture en matière plastique et procédé de fabrication de celle-ci

Publication

EP 0834454 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97303769 A

Priority

EP 97303769 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834454A1] A bag provided with a snap-fit type synthetic resin fastener and formed by bonding a pair of side gussets to the lateral sides of the bag allows to fully utilize a wide opening, provides a large capacity and, at the same time, the upper edges of the side gussets do not interfere with any attempt to fill the bag or take out the contents therefrom smoothly. There is also provided a method of manufacturing a bag as defined above with a reduced number of components that is less cumbersome and less costly but highly efficient. A bag (1) according to the invention is characterized in that front and rear film members (1a and 1b) have respective thermoadhesive inner layers and a pair of side gussets (4,4) have respective inner layers thermally adhesive relative to the inner layers of the film members (1a and 1b) and are folded with the outer surface facing inside to show a V-shaped cross section, the upper edges (4b, 4b) of said side gussets (4,4) being bonded to the inner surface of either one of the front and rear film members (1a and 1b) by means of one of a pair of sealing tapes (8,8) provided respectively with a female profile (3a) and a male profile (3b) of the snap-fit type fastener (3) and having thermoadhesiveness relative to the inner layers of said film members (1a and 1b) and the those of the side gussets (4,4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/25

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 30/20 (2006.01); B65D 33/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/2533 (2013.01); B65D 31/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0834454 A1 19980408; EP 0834454 B1 20000209; DE 69701273 D1 20000316; DE 69701273 T2 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150717

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701273

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981112

1998-12-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

1998-12-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-06-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980424

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB