Global Patent Index - EP 0834591 B1

EP 0834591 B1 2000-11-08 - Apparatus and process for hot-dip coating of steel sheets

Title (en)

Apparatus and process for hot-dip coating of steel sheets

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Verzinken von Stahlband

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de revêtement de tôles d'acier par immersion

Publication

EP 0834591 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97870147 A

Priority

BE 9600837 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834591A1] Sheets or a continuous band of steel are coated with metal by being passed continuously from an annealing furnace into a bath of the molten metal through a metal duct whose lower end dips into the bath, the lower part of the duct being controllably heated to around the temperature of the bath. Also claimed is a vessel containing a bath of molten metal with a metal duct dipping into it and means to guide steel sheet through the duct and into the bath, wherein at least the lower part of the duct level with the bath surface is double-walled to accommodate controllable heaters.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 2/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0834591 A1 19980408; EP 0834591 B1 20001108; AT 197482 T 20001111; BE 1010666 A3 19981103; DE 69703475 D1 20001214; DE 69703475 T2 20010315; ES 2152077 T3 20010116; PT 834591 E 20010330

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160901

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2008-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001213

2001-01-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152077 T3

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703475 20001214

2000-11-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197482 T 20001111

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990205

1999-11-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR HOT-DIP COATING OF STEEL SHEETS

1999-10-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR HOT-DIP COATING OF STEEL SHEETS

1999-10-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR HOT-DIP COATING OF STEEL SHEETS

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990205

1998-12-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL PT SE

1998-12-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL PT SE

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971013

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL PT SE

1998-04-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI