Global Patent Index - EP 0834638 A3

EP 0834638 A3 2000-09-20 - Fixing of closing and/or abutting profiles in doors, windows or the like

Title (en)

Fixing of closing and/or abutting profiles in doors, windows or the like

Title (de)

Befestigung eines Schliess- und/oder Anschlagprofiles bei Fenster, Türen oder dgl.

Title (fr)

Fixation d'un profilé de fermeture et/ou de butée dans une fenêtre, porte ou similaire

Publication

EP 0834638 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 97203006 A

Priority

BE 9600825 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834638A2] The window or door comprises a fixed frame and two opening leaves which close a common opening. The two leaves are formed by a frame (5,6) one of which is provided with a closing or end section (7). The fixing has an adjusting point (9) which enables adapting the position of the closing end section relative to the leaf frame to which it is fixed. The adjusting point allows lateral and vertical adjustment. The adjusting point is constituted by two adjustable elements (10) mounted at a distance from each other. These act as retractors mounted between the closing section and the corresponding frame. Each corresponding adjustable element has a coupling (17) with which it is housed by sliding in a notch (18) having inward folded edges (19,20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/36; E06B 3/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/36 (2006.01); E06B 3/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/362 (2013.01); E06B 3/92 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0834638 A2 19980408; EP 0834638 A3 20000920; BE 1010660 A3 19981103

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI