Global Patent Index - EP 0834699 A3

EP 0834699 A3 2000-06-07 - Glow plug

Title (en)

Glow plug

Title (de)

Glühkerze

Title (fr)

Bougie à incandescence

Publication

EP 0834699 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97117142 A

Priority

JP 26472196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834699A2] A heater tube (3) comprises a smaller-diameter portion (31) and a larger-diameter portion (32). A first resistor (4) and a second resistor (5) are provided in the heater tube (3). The second resistor (5) has a positive resistance-temperature coefficient larger than that of the first resistor (4). The first resistor (4) and the second resistor (5) are electrically connected in series. The entire body of the first resistor (4) and 3/4 of the second resistor (5) are accommodated in the smaller-diameter portion (31). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] DE 4001296 A1 19900816 - JIDOSHA KIKI CO [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0834699 A2 19980408; EP 0834699 A3 20000607; EP 0834699 B1 20030102; DE 69718121 D1 20030206; DE 69718121 T2 20030821; JP 3870454 B2 20070117; JP H10110953 A 19980428

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69718121 P 20030206

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: 20030102

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-05-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOYAMA, TAIJI

1998-05-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ISHII, HIROHISA C/O DENSO CORPORATION

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-04-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI