Global Patent Index - EP 0834707 A4

EP 0834707 A4 2000-05-31 - OUTDOOR UNIT FOR SEPARATE TYPE AIR-CONDITIONERS

Title (en)

OUTDOOR UNIT FOR SEPARATE TYPE AIR-CONDITIONERS

Title (de)

AUSSENEINHEIT FUR KLIMAANLAGE MIT GETRENNTEN GERÄTEN

Title (fr)

UNITE EXTERNE POUR DES APPAREILS DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR SEPARES

Publication

EP 0834707 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97917444 A

Priority

  • JP 9701360 W
  • JP 12390996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9740324A1] In an outdoor unit for a separate type air-conditioner which is provided with operating valves (4a, 4b), to which refrigerant pipes extending from an indoor unit are connected, on an operating valve bracket (9), techniques for easily and speedily carrying out operations for connecting or disconnecting the refrigerant pipes to or from the operating valves (4a, 4b) have been developed. A recess (20) for securing a clearance between the operating valve bracket (9) and operating nuts (4c) for the operating valves (4a, 4b) is provided in the same bracket (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 5/00; F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 5/00 (2006.01); F24F 1/32 (2011.01); F24F 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/32 (2013.01); F24F 1/0003 (2013.01); F24F 13/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9740324A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9740324 A1 19971030; EP 0834707 A1 19980408; EP 0834707 A4 20000531; EP 0834707 B1 20031119; ES 2210513 T3 20040701; JP 3771626 B2 20060426; JP H09287776 A 19971104; TW 352825 U 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120422

2013-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130716

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-11-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2210513

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-02-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040219

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT

2003-11-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-05-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: OUTDOOR UNIT FOR A SPLIT TYPE AIR-CONDITIONER

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020524

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980504

2000-05-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 24F 5/00 A, 7F 24F 1/00 B

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT