Global Patent Index - EP 0834790 B1

EP 0834790 B1 2002-11-13 - Interfitting structure for control knob and shaft

Title (en)

Interfitting structure for control knob and shaft

Title (de)

Zusammensetzbare Struktur für Kontrollknopf und Welle

Title (fr)

Mécanisme d'emboîtement pour bouton et arbre de commande

Publication

EP 0834790 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97116563 A

Priority

JP 26219796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834790A1] A shaft (24) of synthetic resin has a first fitting member (36) having a noncircular cross-sectional shape and a second fitting member (38) disposed substantially coaxially with the first fitting member (36), having a noncircular cross-sectional shape, and being larger in diameter than the first fitting member (36). A control knob (14) has a bottomed hole (22) including a fitting hole (28) receiving and complementary in shape to the first fitting member (36) and an annular step (30) receiving and complementary in shape to the second fitting member (38). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05G 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/08 (2006.01); B60H 1/00 (2006.01); G05G 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0834790 A1 19980408; EP 0834790 B1 20021113; DE 69717048 D1 20021219; DE 69717048 T2 20030424; JP 3468640 B2 20031117; JP H10105266 A 19980424

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69717048

- Effective date: 20110401

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090917

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717048 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010517

1998-12-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

1998-12-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970923

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1998-04-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI