Global Patent Index - EP 0834821 A3

EP 0834821 A3 2001-12-05 - Network archiver system and storage medium storing program to construct network archiver system

Title (en)

Network archiver system and storage medium storing program to construct network archiver system

Title (de)

Netzwerkarchivierungssystem und Speichermedium, welches ein Programm speichert, um ein Netzwerkarchivierungssystem herzustellen

Title (fr)

Système d'archivage de réseau et médium de stockage stockant un programme pour construire un système d'archivage de réseau

Publication

EP 0834821 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97301594 A

Priority

JP 26051696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834821A2] In response to a forming request, an archiver forming module(21)compresses a data file on a network (10) and stores it into an archiver. In response to a referring request, an archiver referring module (22) reads out the compressed data file from the archiver, reconstructs it on the network, and stores the reconstructed data file into the archiver. An archiver managing module concentratedly manages the archiver on the network. An archiver concentration type processing apparatus in a sharing group (25) is set to a host (24) and remaining archiver distribution type processing apparatuses are set to clients (26-1 to 26-4). The archiver, archiver forming module, and archiver referring module are arranged in each of the host and the clients. Concentration processes and distribution processes are allowed to mixedly exist on the network. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30; G06F 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30073 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99952 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99953 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99955 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0834821 A2 19980408; EP 0834821 A3 20011205; EP 0834821 B1 20050601; DE 69733391 D1 20050707; DE 69733391 T2 20051013; US 5956733 A 19990921

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170310

2017-04-05 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170310

2017-03-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69733391

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160308

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-05-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69733391 P 20050707

2005-06-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-06-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040122

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020327

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 17/30 A, 7G 06F 11/14 B

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI