Global Patent Index - EP 0834854 A3

EP 0834854 A3 2000-10-25 - Method of displaying a product information message by an electronic price label

Title (en)

Method of displaying a product information message by an electronic price label

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Anzeigen einer Produktinformation-Nachricht auf einem elektronischen Preisschild

Title (fr)

Méthode pour afficher un message d'information de produit sur une étiquette électronique de prix

Publication

EP 0834854 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97306256 A

Priority

  • US 72659496 A
  • US 72659596 A
  • US 72659696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834854A2] Product information messages 38 relating to product promotions, sale restrictions of products or products eligible for government subsistence programs, are stored in an EPL additional data file 28 in the memory 24 of an EPL computer 12, together with product information indicators 39 which uniquely identify each product information message 38. When a product information message 38 is to be displayed by an EPL 14 associated with a particular product, a product information indicator corresponding to the message 38 to be displayed is input by an operator to the record for that product in a price look-up (PLU) file 36. A control message addressed to the EPL (14) associated with that product is generated by reading the product information indicator 39 from the PLU file 36 and the corresponding product information message 38 from the EPL additional data file 28. The control message is transmitted to the EPL 14 and the product information message is displayed by a display 22 of the EPL 14. No paper labels, tags or notices need be installed in order to convey the information message to a customer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60; G09F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/00 (2006.01); G06Q 30/00 (2006.01); G06Q 50/00 (2006.01); G09F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0834854 A2 19980408; EP 0834854 A3 20001025; AU 3604197 A 19980409; AU 721810 B2 20000713; JP H10232613 A 19980902; NZ 328582 A 19981125

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011103

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 17/60 A, 7G 09F 9/00 B

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL