Global Patent Index - EP 0834904 B1

EP 0834904 B1 2000-09-13 - High pressure mercury ultraviolet lamp

Title (en)

High pressure mercury ultraviolet lamp

Title (de)

Hochdruck Quecksilber-Ultravioletlampe

Title (fr)

Lampe ultraviolette au mercure à haute pression

Publication

EP 0834904 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97117311 A

Priority

JP 28286496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834904A2] A high pressure mercury ultraviolet lamp with high dimensional accuracy in which the emitter material during lamp operation is prevented from spraying and being deposited onto the wall of the discharge vessel and the UV radiation transmission factor is prevented from being reduced is achieved by the fact that at least one of a group of halides which consists of halides of yttrium lanthanum, cerium, dysprosium, gadolinium and thorium and at least one of a group of halides which consists of halides of alkali metal elements are filled at a filling ratio in the range from 1:4 to 1:20 to one another as a molar fraction. This also yields the same action as the application of emitter material to the upholding parts of the electrodes. Furthermore, high dimensional accuracy can be ensured by the measure by which the discharge vessel is made of a translucent ceramic, such as YAG. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/20; H01J 61/073; H01J 61/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/20 (2006.01); H01J 61/30 (2006.01); H01J 61/82 (2006.01); H01J 61/88 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/822 (2013.01); H01J 61/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0834904 A2 19980408; EP 0834904 A3 19980603; EP 0834904 B1 20000913; DE 69703079 D1 20001019; DE 69703079 T2 20010322; JP 3269976 B2 20020402; JP H10112283 A 19980428; US 5905341 A 19990518

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-08-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69703079

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-05-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20130501

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111020

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703079

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-19

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2000-05-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000126

1999-02-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE NL

1999-02-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE NL

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980615

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL