Global Patent Index - EP 0834966 B1

EP 0834966 B1 2002-11-20 - Plug connector for a circuit board assembly below a cover

Title (en)

Plug connector for a circuit board assembly below a cover

Title (de)

Steckverbindung für eine unterhalb einer Abdeckung befindliche Baugruppe

Title (fr)

Connecteur enfichable pour plaquette à circuits située au-dessous d'un couvercle

Publication

EP 0834966 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115810 A

Priority

DE 29617238 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0834966A2] A circuit module (1) within a housing, e.g. of a motor, and used for control is to be externally connected. For this purpose a number of contact pins (3) are soldered into holes and project so as to pass through holes (6) in an insulating plate (5) fitted into an aperture in the cover plate. The pins engage with contact bushes (4) in a connecting plug or socket (2.2). An alternative has contact pins formed as bushes that engage solid pins on a connector.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/74; H01R 12/16; H01R 12/22; H01R 12/24; H01R 13/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/70 (2011.01); H01R 12/79 (2011.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/74 (2006.01); H01R 13/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/7082 (2013.01); H01R 12/79 (2013.01); H01R 13/521 (2013.01); H01R 13/74 (2013.01); H01R 13/64 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29617238 U1 19961121; AT 228273 T 20021215; EP 0834966 A2 19980408; EP 0834966 A3 19991201; EP 0834966 B1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2006-09-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708764 20030102

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228273 T 20021215

2002-02-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/74 A, 7H 01R 12/22 B, 7H 01R 12/24 B, 7H 01R 12/16 B, 7H 01R 13/52 B

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010910

2000-08-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991027

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6H 01R 13/74 A, 6H 01R 23/72 B, 6H 01R 23/66 B, 6H 01R 23/68 B, 6H 01R 13/52 B

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

1998-04-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI