Global Patent Index - EP 0835094 B1

EP 0835094 B1 2003-06-18 - COSMETIC FILTER COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING DIBENZOYLMETHANE, ALKYL BETA'-DIPHENYLACRYLATE AND BENZOTRIAZOLE SILICONE

Title (en)

COSMETIC FILTER COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING DIBENZOYLMETHANE, ALKYL BETA'-DIPHENYLACRYLATE AND BENZOTRIAZOLE SILICONE

Title (de)

FILTRIERENDE KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND EIN DIBENZOYLMETHAN, EIN BETA-ALKYL-DIPHENYLACRYLAT UND EIN BENZOTRIAZOL-SILIKON-POLYMER

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES FILTRANTES CONTENANT UN DIBENZOYLMETHANE, UN BETA'-DIPHENYLACRYLATE D'ALKYLE ET UNE SILICONE BENZOTRIAZOLE

Publication

EP 0835094 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97919480 A

Priority

  • FR 9700606 W
  • FR 9604360 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2747037A1] Novel cosmetic compositions containing, in a cosmetically acceptable carrier, one or more dibenzoylmethane derivatives, one or more alkyl beta , beta '-diphenylacrylate derivatives and one or more specific benzotriazole silicones are disclosed. These compositions have enhanced sun protection factors due to a synergistic effect between these three filters. The use of these compositions in the field of cosmetics is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/31 (2006.01); A61K 8/35 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/40 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 8/58 (2006.01); A61K 8/896 (2006.01); A61K 8/898 (2006.01); A61Q 1/00 (2006.01); A61Q 1/04 (2006.01); A61Q 1/06 (2006.01); A61Q 1/10 (2006.01); A61Q 1/12 (2006.01); A61Q 5/04 (2006.01); A61Q 5/08 (2006.01); A61Q 5/10 (2006.01); A61Q 17/04 (2006.01); C08L 83/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/898 (2013.01); A61K 8/35 (2013.01); A61K 8/37 (2013.01); A61K 8/40 (2013.01); A61K 8/585 (2013.01); A61Q 17/04 (2013.01); A61K 2800/57 (2013.01); A61K 2800/59 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2747037 A1 19971010; FR 2747037 B1 19980529; AR 006489 A1 19990825; AT 243022 T 20030715; AU 2393597 A 19971029; AU 692734 B2 19980611; BR 9706575 A 19990720; CA 2219863 A1 19971016; CA 2219863 C 20040615; CN 1137676 C 20040211; CN 1188406 A 19980722; CZ 290237 B6 20020612; CZ 9800021 A3 19980812; DE 69722880 D1 20030724; DE 69722880 T2 20040513; EA 000577 B1 19991229; EA 199700442 A1 19980827; EP 0835094 A1 19980415; EP 0835094 B1 20030618; ES 2201292 T3 20040316; HU 9900608 A2 19990728; HU 9900608 A3 20000928; JP 2001525792 A 20011211; JP 3359643 B2 20021224; KR 100256840 B1 20000515; MX 9709128 A 19980331; NO 311065 B1 20011008; NO 975611 A 19980205; NO 975611 D0 19971204; NZ 328975 A 20000128; PL 186951 B1 20040430; PL 323564 A1 19980414; US 5955061 A 19990921; WO 9737634 A1 19971016; ZA 9702594 B 19971020

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170404

2017-07-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170726

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170402

2017-04-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170402

2017-04-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69722880

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: L'*OREAL

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: L'*OREAL

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050403

2004-06-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040617

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040416

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-15 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20040415

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-26 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20040326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201292 T3

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031006

2003-09-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-09-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-09-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-09-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722880 P 20030724

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980416

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE