Global patent index - EP 0835220 B1

EP 0835220 B1 2001-04-04 - EXTENDIBLE BOOM, PARTICULARLY FOR CRANES

Title (en)

EXTENDIBLE BOOM, PARTICULARLY FOR CRANES

Title (de)

AUSZIEHBARER AUSLEGER, INSBESONDERE FÜR KRÄNE

Title (fr)

FLECHE EXTENSIBLE PARTICULIEREMENT DESTINEE A DES GRUES

Publication

EP 0835220 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96915286 A

Priority

  • SE 9600606 W
  • SE 9502099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9641764A1] A double-acting hydraulic unit (1) for telescopic booms comprises a cylinder (2) and a hollow piston rod (4) with a piston (3) that divides the cylinder into a piston side chamber (5) and a piston rod chamber (7). Two main conduits (10, 11) lead to the cylinder and two main conduits (10', 11') lead away from the piston rod to a co-operating hydraulic unit. Within the piston rod (4), there is a displaceable transmission element (16) that is arranged to actuate a locking device which in an active state engages into a seat (19) in a gable portion (8) to the cylinder (2). When the transmission element (16) is in an inner end position, the locking device (17) is inactive, whereby the piston (3) is freely movable relative to the cylinder. When the piston (3) reaches an outer end position at the same time as the actuation of the transmission element (16) by a carrier of an adjacent hydraulic unit terminates, then the transmission element is displaced axially, a wedge body (21) actuating the locking device (17) so that it engages into the seat (19). In this way the piston rod is locked mechanically and automatically in its outer end position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/70; B66C 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/693 (2006.01); B66C 23/70 (2006.01); F15B 11/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/205 (2013.01); B66C 23/705 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9641764 A1 19961227; AT 200266 T 20010415; AU 5709596 A 19970109; DE 69612380 D1 20010510; DE 69612380 T2 20010913; EP 0835220 A1 19980415; EP 0835220 B1 20010404; SE 504463 C2 19970217; SE 9502099 D0 19950608; SE 9502099 L 19961209

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050509

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040509

2003-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-08 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030508

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612380

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-04-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200266

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000324

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971122

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT