Global Patent Index - EP 0835298 B1

EP 0835298 B1 2001-05-23 - ALKALINE TREATMENT METHOD FOR REFINING USED OILS

Title (en)

ALKALINE TREATMENT METHOD FOR REFINING USED OILS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM RAFFINIEREN VON VERBRAUCHTEN SCHMIERÖLEN DURCH ALKALIBEHANDLUNG.

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE RAFFINAGE D'HUILES USAGEES PAR TRAITEMENT ALCALIN

Publication

EP 0835298 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96924004 A

Priority

  • FR 9600974 W
  • FR 9507484 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2735785A1] An alkaline treatment method for refining used oils, wherein (a) the used oils are distilled; (b) the resulting distillate is treated with an alkaline agent in the presence of a solvent selected from water, a monoalcohol, a polyalcohol and a mixture of said alcohols, said alkaline agent being present in a percentage by weight, based on the weight of the distillate, equal to the product F x (IA + IS), where F is a multiplier between 2 and 50 and IA and IS are the acid value and the saponification value respectively of said distillate, at a temperature of around 80-330 DEG C for 2-200 minutes; (c) the reaction medium is washed with water then decanted to recover the oily phase; and (d) said oily phase is distilled. The method is useful for producing refined oils having excellent properties in that they are odourless and nearly colourless and in that they have a very low chlorine, phosphorus and silicon content.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 175/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 175/00 (2006.01); C10M 175/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 175/0016 (2013.01); C10M 175/0025 (2013.01); C10M 175/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2735785 A1 19961227; FR 2735785 B1 19970808; AT 201438 T 20010615; CA 2222704 A1 19970109; DE 69612978 D1 20010628; DE 69612978 T2 20011220; DK 0835298 T3 20010827; EP 0835298 A1 19980415; EP 0835298 B1 20010523; ES 2125208 T1 19990301; ES 2125208 T3 20010901; NO 976008 A 19980223; NO 976008 D0 19971219; US 6072065 A 20000606; WO 9700928 A1 19970109

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-06-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060622

2005-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2004-02-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030621

2004-02-02 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CHAVET BERNARD

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030621

2002-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020716

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020619

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-10-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2125208 T3

2001-08-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-08-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010824

2001-08-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-08-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-08-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612978 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201438 T 20010615

1999-03-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2125208 T1

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981103

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980109

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE