Global Patent Index - EP 0835533 B1

EP 0835533 B1 2000-05-10 - WAVEGUIDE FILTER

Title (en)

WAVEGUIDE FILTER

Title (de)

HOHLLEITERFILTER

Title (fr)

FILTRE POUR GUIDE D'ONDES

Publication

EP 0835533 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96922868 A

Priority

  • DE 19523869 A
  • EP 9602686 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19523869A1] The invention addresses the problem of designing a band-pass filter for a waveguide which can also act as a blocking filter for the suppression of specific interference frequencies. This problem is solved by an arrangement in which a waveguide screen is provided, in addition to a centrally positioned aperture (3), with two other identical apertures (4) which are set, with respect to the natural resonance, for an unwanted interference frequency f(ind S1) and arranged symmetrically about the central aperture (3). The invention can be used to prevent waveguide devices from infringing statutory frequency specifications and for the suppression of interference frequencies.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/208

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/208 (2006.01); H01P 1/212 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/208 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19523869 A1 19970102; CA 2225928 A1 19970123; DE 59605191 D1 20000615; EP 0835533 A1 19980415; EP 0835533 B1 20000510; ES 2147387 T3 20000901; IL 122830 D0 19991130; JP 3242666 B2 20011225; JP H10513025 A 19981208; US 6340922 B1 20020122; WO 9702619 A1 19970123

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070620

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070620

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050621

2006-06-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060619

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060615

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-02-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-06-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-06-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050620

2004-06-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040603

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040602

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040530

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2147387

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605191

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AEROSPACE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990820

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971114

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE