Global Patent Index - EP 0835623 A3

EP 0835623 A3 2000-12-20 - Refrigerated counter

Title (en)

Refrigerated counter

Title (de)

Kühltheke

Title (fr)

Vitrine réfrigérante

Publication

EP 0835623 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97116678 A

Priority

DE 19641474 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0835623A2] The cool counter has a counter trough (2) which is supported by a counter body (1). A food chamber (4) is arranged above a food platform (3) and a trough chamber (15) is arranged underneath the platform. A fan (29) produces an air current (10) which is fed to the food chamber, over the food location area and via a flow channel which is formed by the trough chamber and a feed channel (16). A cooling device (23) and an ultraviolet radiation source (25) are arranged in the flow channel. The cooling device is arranged in the effective area of the ultraviolet radiation source, from which it receives radiation. The ultraviolet radiation source and the cooling device may alternatively be arranged in the feed channel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/04; F25D 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01); F25D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/042 (2013.01); A47F 3/0456 (2013.01); A47F 3/0482 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0835623 A2 19980415; EP 0835623 A3 20001220; EP 0835623 B1 20030326; AT 235179 T 20030415; DE 19641474 A1 19980416; DE 19641474 C2 19980820; ES 2196226 T3 20031216

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170924

2017-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 235179 T

- Effective date: 20170925

2017-10-18 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170924

2017-09-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59709610

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-04-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59709610

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2012-04-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59709610

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196226 T3

2003-07-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59709610 P 20030430

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010615

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47F 3/04 A, 7F 25D 17/04 B

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT