Global Patent Index - EP 0835624 A3

EP 0835624 A3 2000-12-20 - Vending counter, especially a refrigerated one

Title (en)

Vending counter, especially a refrigerated one

Title (de)

Warentheke, insbesondere Kühltheke

Title (fr)

Vitrine pour marchandises, en particulier vitrine réfrigérante

Publication

EP 0835624 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97117633 A

Priority

DE 19642102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19642102C1] The sales cabinet includes a filter (15) through which an airflow (7) is passed to filter out bacteria etc. The filter is arranged at least in part in a static electrical or magnetic field; its material can form the positive pole of the electrical field. The filter can be attached to the positive pole and a support (16) for the filter can be attached to the negative pole of a DC voltage source.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/04; F25D 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/0482 (2013.01); A47F 3/0413 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19642102 C1 19971030; EP 0835624 A2 19980415; EP 0835624 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47F 3/04 A, 7F 25D 17/04 B

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE