Global Patent Index - EP 0835692 A3

EP 0835692 A3 2001-04-25 - Apparatus for applying a coating material on a workpiece

Title (en)

Apparatus for applying a coating material on a workpiece

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Aufbringen von Beschichtungsgut auf einen Gegenstand

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'application d'un produit de revêtement sur un objet

Publication

EP 0835692 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97114150 A

Priority

DE 19641958 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0835692A2] The device has an impact surface and a particle radiating nozzle arrangement from which a flow of particles is ejected and blown against the impact surface, from which they are deflected towards the object to be coated. The particles are charged to a voltage different from that of the object by an electrode arrangement. Two nozzles (7,8) can blow particles (5,6) towards the impact surface (9) from opposite sides. The deflected particles form a common flow (4) directed towards the object (1). The direction of the common particle flow is varied by varying the ejection pressure at least one of the nozzles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/26; B05B 5/08; B05B 7/14; B05B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/26 (2006.01); B05B 5/08 (2006.01); B05B 7/14 (2006.01); B05B 15/04 (2006.01); B05B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/0431 (2013.01); B05B 1/262 (2013.01); B05B 5/087 (2013.01); B05B 7/1486 (2013.01); B05B 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0835692 A2 19980415; EP 0835692 A3 20010425; EP 0835692 B1 20030122; DE 19641958 A1 19980416

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-12-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59709184 P 20030227

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2003-01-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1998-04-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI