Global Patent Index - EP 0835705 B1

EP 0835705 B1 2001-05-23 - Method and apparatus for production of controlled solidified precision casting by centrifugal casting

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for production of controlled solidified precision casting by centrifugal casting

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von gesteuert erstarrten Präzisionsgussteilen durch Schleudergiessen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif permettant une solidification contrôlée de pièces coulées de précision fabriqué par le moulage rotatif

Publication

EP 0835705 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97114168 A

Priority

DE 19639514 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19639514C1] The method concerns production of high-precision castings with controlled solidification by centrifugal casting of a melt under vacuum or a protective gas into a preheated mould (15) with a central pouring channel (19) and several mould cavities directed from this channel towards the outer mould periphery (Da). The mould cavities are surrounded by a material whose heat conduction coefficient is lower than that of copper. Before being cast from the pouring channel (19) the melt is heated at a rate which ensures that a falling temperature gradient of at least of 100 deg C built up between the inner and outer mould peripheries (Di, Da). Also claimed is an apparatus serving for implementation of the method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 13/04; B22D 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 13/10 (2006.01); B22D 13/04 (2006.01); B22D 13/06 (2006.01); B22D 27/00 (2006.01); B22D 27/04 (2006.01); B22D 27/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 13/04 (2013.01); B22D 27/003 (2013.01); B22D 27/045 (2013.01); B22D 27/15 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19639514 C1 19971218; EP 0835705 A1 19980415; EP 0835705 B1 20010523; JP 3267906 B2 20020325; JP H1099955 A 19980421; US 2001045267 A1 20011129; US 6250366 B1 20010626; US 6408929 B2 20020625

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070816

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070816

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070817

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070812

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070816

2008-04-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060814

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-20 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703587 20010628

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-05-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES AG

2000-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: W.C. HERAEUS GMBH & CO. KG

1999-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

1999-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: W.C. HERAEUS GMBH & CO. KG

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990222

1998-12-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

1998-12-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980916

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-04-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI