Global Patent Index - EP 0835726 B1

EP 0835726 B1 2003-06-25 - Powder-actuated fastening tool with magazine for fasteners

Title (en)

Powder-actuated fastening tool with magazine for fasteners

Title (de)

Pulverkraftbetriebenes Setzgerät mit Magazin für Befestigungselemente

Title (fr)

Outil de scellement actionné par poudre avec magasin pour éléments de fixation

Publication

EP 0835726 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810725 A

Priority

DE 19642295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0835726A1] The bolt gun is cartridge fired with the cartridges (24) on a slide feed (25). The bolts are supplied in another slide feed (6) which passes through the spring loaded guide (3) at the head of the gun. To operate the gun it is pressed onto the work surface, with the sprung head depressed axially, until the gun can be fired. The axial movement of the sprung head operates a tilt lever (8) which swings into the path of the bolt magazine and hold it. This prevents the next bolt being moved into the firing position until the gun is pulled back from the work surface, at which point the firing is blocked until the gun is pressed back onto the work surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/18; B25C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/10 (2006.01); B25C 1/00 (2006.01); B25C 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/184 (2013.01); B25C 1/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0835726 A1 19980415; EP 0835726 B1 20030625; DE 19642295 A1 19980416; JP 4112051 B2 20080702; JP H10118955 A 19980512; US 5829661 A 19981103

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710337

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141008

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131002

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-06-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121011

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710337 P 20030731

2003-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020315

1998-12-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

1998-12-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981015

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE