Global Patent Index - EP 0835754 B1

EP 0835754 B1 2001-04-04 - Decentral individual adjustment of gripper supports in sheet feeding cylinders of rotary printing presses

Title (en)

Decentral individual adjustment of gripper supports in sheet feeding cylinders of rotary printing presses

Title (de)

Dezentrale Einzelverstellung von Greiferaufschlagleisten in bogenführenden Zylindern von Rotationsdruckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Réglage décentralisé individuel des surfaces d'appui des pinces dans les cylindres de transport de feuilles des presses rotatives

Publication

EP 0835754 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97116334 A

Priority

DE 19642104 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0835754A2] The grips are spaced over the cylinder and are adjusted to grip and release the paper sheets being processed. Each line of grips has an adjusting rod (16) on which are mounted adjusting wedges. The axial position of the wedges determines the setting of the grips. A servo motor (33) drives each adjusting rod while a sensor (34) monitors the displacement of the rod. The sensors are connected to a controller (38). This enables the grip settings to be adjusted while the roller is rotating. The sensors are linear sensors. Each servo motor drives a simple gearing which includes a gear on the threaded end of the adjusting rod. A stepping motor drives the adjustment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/10; B41F 33/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/05 (2006.01); B41F 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0835754 A2 19980415; EP 0835754 A3 19981216; EP 0835754 B1 20010404; AT 200247 T 20010415; DE 19642104 A1 19980430; DE 19642104 C2 19980910; JP 3220067 B2 20011022; JP H10119244 A 19980512

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050919

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030919

2004-05-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-09-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030920

2003-09-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-09-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030919

2002-09-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020909

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020904

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020827

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703278 20010510

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200247 T 20010415

2001-02-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-11-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

1999-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT SE

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990521

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981112

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

1998-04-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI