Global Patent Index - EP 0835757 B1

EP 0835757 B1 2002-11-27 - Method of driving the piezoelectric elements in a print head of a droplets generator

Title (en)

Method of driving the piezoelectric elements in a print head of a droplets generator

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Ansteuern von Piezoelementen in einem Druckkopf eines Tropfenerzeugers

Title (fr)

Procédé d'actionnement des éléments piézoélectrique dans une tête d'impression d'un générateur de gouttes

Publication

EP 0835757 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810560 A

Priority

CH 244696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0835757A2] The control method controls the piezoelements (11) for the respective ink channels (3) so that the ejection velocity of the ink droplets is independent of the number of ink channels operated simultaneously. The waveform of the activation pulses for the ink jet printing head is modified in dependence on the number of ink channels operated simultaneously, for altering the pulse duration of the suction or ejection pulses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/045

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 29/38 (2013.01); B41J 2/04525 (2013.01); B41J 2/04541 (2013.01); B41J 2/04568 (2013.01); B41J 2/04581 (2013.01); B41J 2/04588 (2013.01); B41J 2/04591 (2013.01); B41J 2202/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0835757 A2 19980415; EP 0835757 A3 19990331; EP 0835757 B1 20021127; CA 2217833 A1 19980408; CA 2217833 C 20050726; CH 691049 A5 20010412; DE 59708813 D1 20030109; US 6286925 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150808

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150808

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708813

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140806

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140806

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090808

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *XAAR TECHNOLOGY LTD

- Effective date: 20040831

2005-05-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *XAAR TECHNOLOGY LTD

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-06-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030809

2003-08-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030808

2003-08-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030801

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030718

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708813 20030109

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: XAAR TECHNOLOGY LIMITED

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PELIKAN HARDCOPY PRODUCTION AG

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000516

1999-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990824

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE