Global patent index - EP 0835809 B1

EP 0835809 B1 2000-01-12 - Tool for tying an article,particularly a bundle of cables

Title (en)

Tool for tying an article,particularly a bundle of cables

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Binden eines Gegenstands, insbesondere eines Kabelbaums

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour encercler un objet, en particulier un faisceau de câbles

Publication

EP 0835809 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117425 A

Priority

DE 29617651 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH10147315A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a binding apparatus which is not complex without friction likely to occur. SOLUTION: Winding scissors 2, 3 placed on a front of a tool body 1 can be opened/closed and a tape can be guided through the scissors around objects to be bound. A tape guide channel 10 placed on the tool body is opened inside the winding scissors 2, 3 and also has an advancing member for advancing the tape having a tape tab, wherein the channel is adjacent to tape guide grooves 20, 21 inside the scissors. At an opening of the tape guide channel 10, a closure holder for holding a closure 12 and a rocking member 15 for pushing the advanced tape toward a surface 11 of the tape guide channel 10 are placed. The rocking member 15 has a front face forming a part of the closure holders 11, 18.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 27/00 (2006.01); B65B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29617651 U1 19980205; EP 0835809 A1 19980415; EP 0835809 B1 20000112; ES 2143826 T3 20000516; JP 3209413 B2 20010917; JP H10147315 A 19980602; PT 835809 E 20000630; US 5845681 A 19981208

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000314

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143826

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-04-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO TECNICO ING. A. MANNUCCI

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59700995

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLERMANNTYTON GMBH

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981207

1998-12-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

1998-12-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980806

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE