Global Patent Index - EP 0835840 B1

EP 0835840 B1 2000-01-26 - Beverage package

Title (en)

Beverage package

Title (de)

Getränkeverpackung

Title (fr)

Conditionnement pour boissons

Publication

EP 0835840 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97118697 A

Priority

  • EP 95306181 A
  • GB 9418625 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0701966A2] There is provided a bottle beverage packaging apparatus and method in which an open topped bottle 20 having a primary chamber charged with beverage 21 containing gas in solution is enclosed together with a closure 8 in a pressure chamber 25 which may be formed against a shoulder of the bottle. The chamber 25 is pressurised with nitrogen gas to pressurise the primary chamber and a secondary chamber 14 in the closure 8 through an aperture 15 of the chamber 14 prior to the closure 8 being displaced by a closure locator 5 to seal the open top of the bottle in the pressurised chamber 25. A projection 11A from the secondary chamber 14 extends into the beverage 20 to locate the aperture 15 beneath the surface thereof. Following sealing of the bottle the chamber 25 is de-pressurised and opened for removal of the sealed package. The chamber 25 may be formed by a tubular shroud 2 carried by a rotating carousel. The secondary chamber 14 may be formed in a hollow insert separate from the closure 8. There is also provided a beverage package in which the closure which may be fitted by the apparatus and system includes a manually openable vent that reduces a headspace pressure in the sealed package to atmospheric pressure for gas to be injected into the beverage through the aperture 15 for froth development prior to removal of the closure from the bottle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67B 3/00; B65D 79/00; B67B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 79/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/73 (2006.01); B67B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/73 (2013.01); B67B 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0701966 A2 19960320; EP 0701966 A3 19960925; EP 0701966 B1 19980715; AU 3064195 A 19960328; AU 689619 B2 19980402; CA 2158308 A1 19960316; DE 69503446 D1 19980820; DE 69503446 T2 19990415; DE 69514842 D1 20000302; DE 69514842 T2 20000706; DK 0701966 T3 19990419; DK 0835840 T3 20000724; EP 0835840 A1 19980415; EP 0835840 B1 20000126; ES 2118506 T3 19980916; ES 2143828 T3 20000516; GB 2293166 A 19960320; GB 9418625 D0 19941102; HK 1008326 A1 20000331; NZ 272996 A 19970129

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150905

2015-11-04 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK9A

2014-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140918

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GUINNESS LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040906

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040905

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GUINNESS LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040905

2003-12-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031208

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031021

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030918

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030915

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030909

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030903

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143828

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69514842

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-02

2000-01-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 701966

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IE NL

1999-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GUINNESS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990223

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980129

1998-04-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 701966

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IE NL