Global Patent Index - EP 0835924 B1

EP 0835924 B1 2002-09-11 - Use of an additive for dispersing calcium sulfate in a lubricating oil for diesel engines

Title (en)

Use of an additive for dispersing calcium sulfate in a lubricating oil for diesel engines

Title (de)

Verwendung eines Zusatzes zur Dispergierung von Calcium Sulfat in Schmieröl für Dieselmotoren

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'un additif pour la dispersion de sulfate de calcium dans une huile de lubrification pour moteurs diesel

Publication

EP 0835924 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96917714 A

Priority

  • JP 9601670 W
  • JP 18356495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9701619A1] A diesel engine lubricating oil additive comprising at least one member selected among carboxylic acids each having a substituted amino group, metal salts thereof, amine salts thereof and amides derived therefrom, each having the function of dispersing hydrous calcium sulfate in oils; and a diesel engine lubricating oil composition containing the additive(s). The addition of the additive and the composition serves to extremely improve the function of dispersing the hydrous calcium sulfate contained in the lubricating oil, enhance the function of dispersing the contaminants contained in the lubricating oil, such as soot or sludge, in oils, extremely improve the function of cleaning the lubricating oil, reduce the concentration of the metallic cleaning agents to be added thereto, and prolong the service life of the lubricating oil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 133/06; C10M 163/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 133/04 (2006.01); C10M 133/06 (2006.01); C10M 133/08 (2006.01); C10M 133/16 (2006.01); C10M 163/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/04 (2006.01); C10N 40/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 133/06 (2013.01); C10M 133/04 (2013.01); C10M 133/08 (2013.01); C10M 133/16 (2013.01); C10M 133/52 (2013.01); C10M 137/10 (2013.01); C10M 159/22 (2013.01); C10M 159/24 (2013.01); C10M 163/00 (2013.01); C10M 2207/028 (2013.01); C10M 2207/262 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/082 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/24 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2217/046 (2013.01); C10M 2217/06 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2219/089 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/102 (2013.01); C10N 2240/103 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9701619 A1 19970116; DE 69623625 D1 20021017; DE 69623625 T2 20030522; EP 0835924 A1 19980415; EP 0835924 A4 19981223; EP 0835924 B1 20020911; JP H0913067 A 19970114

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100617

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100617

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090617

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623625 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-11-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF AN ADDITIVE FOR DISPERSING CALCIUM SULFATE IN A LUBRICATING OIL FOR DIESEL ENGINES

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010330

1998-12-23 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19981106

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-23 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M133/06

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971222

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB