Global Patent Index - EP 0836067 B1

EP 0836067 B1 2002-11-20 - Rifle with bipod mounting

Title (en)

Rifle with bipod mounting

Title (de)

Gewehr mit Zweibein

Title (fr)

Fusil muni d'un support du type bipied

Publication

EP 0836067 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115494 A

Priority

AT 52796 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0836067A2] The front of the rifle has a folding support hinged at the front of the stock to steady the weapon when used in the prone position. The front of the stock has a longitudinal bore to hold a swivel post (11) attached to the head (10) of the stand mounting. This allows the stand to swivel to either side and allows the two legs to be splayed. The legs are linked to the head by jointed connectors and covered with elastic to prevent injury. The swivel movement of the post is limited by a cross bar (13) loosely fitted into a slot (14) across the post. This also prevents the stand from being pulled out of the stock.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 23/08; F41C 23/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41C 27/22 (2006.01); F41A 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 23/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0836067 A2 19980415; EP 0836067 A3 19990317; EP 0836067 B1 20021120; AT 1744 U1 19971027; CZ 7133 U1 19980513; DE 59708765 D1 20030102; US 5852892 A 19981229

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170907

2017-10-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-09-27 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170907

2017-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-09-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708765

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-03-07 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-03-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-01-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH, WIENER NEUSTADT, AT

- Document: DE 59708765

- Effective date: 20131128

2014-01-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59708765

- Representative's name: V. FUENER EBBINGHAUS FINCK HANO, DE

- Effective date: 20131128

2013-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL AND PARTN, CH

2013-12-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH, AT

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH

- Free text: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH#EYERSPERGRING 4/5#2700 WIENER NEUSTADT (AT) -TRANSFER TO- STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH#EYERSPERGRING 4/5#2700 WIENER NEUSTADT (AT)

2004-04-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2004-04-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-04-16 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2004-04-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-12-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ANDRE ROLAND CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INTELLECTUELLE

2003-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH

- Free text: STEYR-DAIMLER-PUCH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#FRANZ-JOSEFS-KAI 51#1010 WIEN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH#EYERSPERGRING 4/5#2700 WIENER NEUSTADT (AT)

2003-11-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING G.M.B.H.EYERSPERIGRING 4

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-11-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-11-30 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING G.M.B.H.EYERSPERIGRING 4

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030207

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708765 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011023

1999-12-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990806

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1998-04-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI