Global Patent Index - EP 0836070 B1

EP 0836070 B1 2001-12-05 - Armoured vehicle

Title (en)

Armoured vehicle

Title (de)

Gepanzertes Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Véhicule blindé

Publication

EP 0836070 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117300 A

Priority

DE 19642386 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19642386C1] On the periphery of the viewing hood (12), at least area-wise, devices (42, 44, 46, 50, 56, 76) are provided for direct and indirect viewing, which by rotation of the viewing hood can be brought into predetermined positions for direct or indirect viewing within the field of vision of the occupant (40). The viewing hood is formed rotation-symmetrically and partly with its peripheral surface is arranged in the protected profile area of the housing (20) of the vehicle (10), so that the peripheral surface is screened area-wise. It has an entry aperture (58) closable by a hatch (60). The devices for direct and indirect viewing comprise at least one angle mirror secure against firing (50) or a recess (42) in the periphery of the viewing hood containing armoured glass provided with a wiping and washing facility (44, 46).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19642386 C1 19980129; EP 0836070 A1 19980415; EP 0836070 B1 20011205

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161007

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161007

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705653

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151031

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705653 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000127

1999-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRAUSS-MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & CO. KG

1998-12-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1998-12-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981015

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB