Global Patent Index - EP 0836278 A3

EP 0836278 A3 2000-02-23 - Elastic surface wave filter device

Title (en)

Elastic surface wave filter device

Title (de)

Filteranordnung mit elastischen Oberflächenwellen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de filtrage à ondes élastiques de surface

Publication

EP 0836278 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97117419 A

Priority

JP 26839796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0836278A2] Disclosed is an elastic surface wave filter device which can realize balanced operation with a neutral terminal kept at a ground potential, and is adaptable for any system of unbalanced input - balanced output or balanced input - unbalanced output even with an input and an output being different in characteristic impedance from each other. An elastic surface wave filter (3b) having a predetermined phase is cascaded to an elastic surface wave filter (4) having a phase different about 180 degrees from the predetermined phase to form a first set of cascaded elastic surface wave filters. An elastic surface wave filter (3a) having the predetermined phase is cascaded to an elastic surface wave filter (3c) having the predetermined phase to form a second set of cascaded elastic surface wave filters. One of input/output terminals of the first set of cascaded elastic surface wave filters and one of input/output terminals of the second set of cascaded elastic surface wave filters are electrically connected in parallel to an unbalanced input/output terminal (6). The other input/output terminal of the first set of cascaded elastic surface wave filters and the other input/output terminal of the second set of cascaded elastic surface wave filters are electrically connected in series to balanced input/output terminals (9a, 9b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03H 9/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03H 9/145 (2006.01); H03H 9/00 (2006.01); H03H 9/25 (2006.01); H03H 9/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03H 9/0028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[XA] FR 2682833 A1 19930423 - THOMSON CSF [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0836278 A2 19980415; EP 0836278 A3 20000223; EP 0836278 B1 20020724; DE 69714178 D1 20020829; DE 69714178 T2 20021114; JP 3186604 B2 20010711; JP H10117123 A 19980506; KR 100275260 B1 20001215; US 5994980 A 19991130

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161012

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69714178 20020829

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001030

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB SE

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE