Global Patent Index - EP 0836422 A4

EP 0836422 A4 2000-08-16 - LAPARASCOPIC SUTURING DEVICE AND SUTURE NEEDLES

Title (en)

LAPARASCOPIC SUTURING DEVICE AND SUTURE NEEDLES

Title (de)

NÄHMATERIAL UND NÄHNADEL ZUM GEBRAUCH BEI LAPAROSKOPIE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR SUTURE SOUS LAPAROSCOPIE ET AIGUILLES DE SUTURE

Publication

EP 0836422 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96916426 A

Priority

US 9601789 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9737594A1] This invention is a surgical suturing needle (45) which includes an elongated shaft having a first end tapered to a point, a second end, and a medial portion. The medial portion includes an axially aligned groove (46) leading to a blind hole into which a surgical suture (48) is fixedly attached. Also disclosed is a suture needle holder (10) which includes an elongated tube (31) having an internal cavity, a distal rounded surface (35) with an external groove (36) of a depth to retain a suture therein. The suture needle holder also includes a pair of wings (37) adjacent the distal end wherein each wing is pivotally attached to the tube at one end of the wing, and has a needle holder (38) at the other end of the wing. The suture needle holder further includes a control element (32) connected to the pair of wings for controlling the pivoting motion thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/00; A61B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/04 (2006.01); A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/0469 (2013.01); A61B 17/0057 (2013.01); A61B 17/06004 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00637 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00663 (2013.01); A61B 2017/047 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0472 (2013.01); A61B 2017/06042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9737594 A1 19971016; AU 5917696 A 19971029; EP 0836422 A1 19980422; EP 0836422 A4 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030515

2000-08-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 17/00 A, 7A 61B 17/04 B

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971113

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL