Global Patent Index - EP 0836542 B1

EP 0836542 B1 2000-10-18 - MANUAL GRINDING MACHINE-TOOL AND GRINDING TOOL

Title (en)

MANUAL GRINDING MACHINE-TOOL AND GRINDING TOOL

Title (de)

HANDSCHLEIFWERKZEUGMASCHINE UND SCHLEIFWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

MACHINE-OUTIL MANUELLE A RECTIFIER ET OUTIL A RECTIFIER

Publication

EP 0836542 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96918586 A

Priority

  • DE 9601080 W
  • DE 19524084 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19524084A1] A manual grinding machine (10; 50; 50) with a grinding tool has an elastic pad (30; 60; 94) arranged between an abrasive means, in particular an abrasive disk, and a rubbing plate. In order to make this manual grinding machine particularly suitable for grinding profiled workpieces, the pad (30; 60; 94) is designed as an easily deformable container with a variable volume that may be closed in a gas-tight manner and evacuated and that can receive a granulated filling material or the like (34; 64; 96).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/00 (2006.01); B24B 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19524084 A1 19970102; CN 1116961 C 20030806; CN 1189794 A 19980805; EP 0836542 A1 19980422; EP 0836542 B1 20001018; JP H11508494 A 19990727; US 5931727 A 19990803; WO 9702111 A1 19970123

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606029

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150804

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110619

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110619

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100401

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-06-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050619

2002-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-03-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-01-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606029 20001123

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990128

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990128

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980202

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI