Global Patent Index - EP 0836673 B1

EP 0836673 B1 2002-11-20 - COOLING FAN FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

COOLING FAN FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

LÜFTER FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

VENTILATEUR POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0836673 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97918147 A

Priority

  • DE 19617414 A
  • EP 9701950 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19617414A1] Known cooling fans for internal combustion engines designed to prevent an unintentional entrainment of the fan wheel are equipped with braking and locking devices, which imply a corresponding construction of the clutch and hence are relatively complicated. The invention proposes that the fluid friction clutch (6) be combined with a locking device in the form of a swivel hook (15) that can be rigidly mounted with a holding device (7), even as a retrofit, and can be released using an electromagnet (10). This electromagnet (10) can be accommodated in the circuit of the ignition lock (23) so that when the engine is started the fan wheel is prevented from following into unwanted rotation. The invention is used for fluid friction clutches of engine cooling fans.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 7/08; F01P 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 7/04 (2006.01); F01P 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 7/081 (2013.01); F01P 7/042 (2013.01); F01P 2025/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19617414 A1 19971106; EP 0836673 A1 19980422; EP 0836673 B1 20021120; JP H11511829 A 19991012; WO 9741337 A1 19971106

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050418

2005-11-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-04-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050418

2005-04-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050418

2004-05-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040426

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040421

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040405

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030224

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708766 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010330

1999-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BEHR GMBH & CO.

1999-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAGENTA GMBH SYSTEMLIEFERANT FUER ELEKTROMAGNETIS

1999-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971126

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE