Global Patent Index - EP 0836756 B1

EP 0836756 B1 2004-12-08 - CONNECTOR WITH INTEGRATED PCB ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

CONNECTOR WITH INTEGRATED PCB ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

STECKVERBINDER MIT INTEGRIERTEM LEITERPLATTENZUSAMMENBAU

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR A ENSEMBLE INTEGRE CARTE A CIRCUITS IMPRIMES

Publication

EP 0836756 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96922643 A

Priority

  • EP 96922643 A
  • EP 95201811 A
  • US 9611214 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0752739A1] A connector, preferably a right angle connector, comprising one or more integrated pcb assemblies (1), each of said pcb assemblies comprising an insulating substrate (16), a spacer (17) and a cover plate (18), each of said insulating substrates (16) comprising a predetermined pattern of conducting tracks (11) on a first surface, each of said conducting tracks (11) having one end for connection to one first contact terminal (4) for mating contact with a mating contact terminal of a mating connector, and another end for connection to one second contact terminal (7) wherein each of the spacers (17) are provided with a first set of one or more first openings (24) each arranged for accommodating at least part of one first contact terminal (4) and with a second set of one or more second openings (25) each arranged for accommodating at least part of one second contact terminal (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/648 (2006.01); H01R 12/50 (2011.01); H01R 13/518 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 23/688 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0752739 A1 19970108; EP 0752739 B1 20001025; CN 1244959 A 20000216; DE 69519226 D1 20001130; DE 69519226 T2 20010823; DE 69634005 D1 20050113; DE 69634005 T2 20051103; EP 0836756 A1 19980422; EP 0836756 A4 19990825; EP 0836756 B1 20041208; IN 190516 B 20030802; JP 2001525974 A 20011211; JP 2006108115 A 20060420; JP 3784836 B2 20060614; JP 4486028 B2 20100623; KR 100394531 B1 20030919; TW 369740 B 19990911; WO 9702627 A1 19970123

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69634005

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FCI, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI, VERSAILLES, FR

- Document: DE 69634005

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69634005

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080702

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080702

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070706

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69634005 P 20050113

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 12/16 A

2004-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FCI

2003-10-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CONNECTOR WITH INTEGRATED PCB ASSEMBLY

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000918

1999-08-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19990708

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6H 01R 23/68 A

1998-09-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V.

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980116

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB