Global Patent Index - EP 0836812 B1

EP 0836812 B1 2001-12-19 - Snowboard boot

Title (en)

Snowboard boot

Title (de)

Snowboard-Stiefel

Title (fr)

Bottes de snowboard

Publication

EP 0836812 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115758 A

Priority

DE 19642743 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0836812A1] The boot comprises a soft inner boot (1), a hard outer boot (2), a soft shaft (4) and a rigid calf support (17). At the level of the joint between the foot and the lower leg, the calf support is pivotably linked to the ankle area of the hard boot part around an axis running along the boot longitudinal direction. The calf support is arranged between the soft inner boot and the soft shaft of the outer boot. The hard boot part (3) extends over the foot from the toe area (15) to the instep area (9) of the boot and on both sides has a recess, which extends from the instep area and from the heel area downwards, beneath the ankle. A tongue (10) may ve fixed to the hard boot part, so that the soft shaft of the outer boot can engage around it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04; A43B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0401 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 5435080 A 19950725 - MEISELMAN JAMIE [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0836812 A1 19980422; EP 0836812 B1 20011219; AT 210931 T 20020115; DE 19642743 A1 19980430; DE 19642743 C2 19990527; JP H10146201 A 19980602

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705867 20020131

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-12-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210931 T 20020115

2000-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEAD SPORT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000323

1999-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

1999-01-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980923

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1998-04-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI