Global Patent Index - EP 0836827 B1

EP 0836827 B1 2000-11-29 - A household vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

A household vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Staubsauger für den Haushalt

Title (fr)

Aspirateur de nettoyage ménager

Publication

EP 0836827 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96830540 A

Priority

EP 96830540 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0836827A1] A double-cyclone domestic vacuum cleaner in which a first cyclone (1), separable from a coaxial second cyclone (14) inside the said first cyclone, collects the coarser particulate material and deposits it in a first container (3) and the said second cyclone collects the finer dust, the first container and the first and second cyclones being transversed by an axial suction duct (6) which connects the top of the second cyclone (14) with suction means (31). The second cyclone has an axial sleeve (20) which engages the axial suction duct (6) and forms at the bottom of the second cyclone a toroidal dust collection chamber, which can be opened by moving the sleeve (20) and the second cyclone (14) relative to each other for disposing of the dust. Alternatively, the toroidal chamber may house a disposable capsule (43, 48) for collecting and storing dust, which is inserted through an openable lid (44) on the second cyclone (14) which can be sealed, before being removed, without needing to open the lid (44). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 5/00; A47L 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/1633 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0836827 A1 19980422; EP 0836827 B1 20001129; DE 69611093 D1 20010104; DE 69611093 T2 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091021

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091021

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-05-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081010

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081009

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081017

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611093 20010104

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-11-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981218

1999-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

1999-01-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970709

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1998-04-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI