Global Patent Index - EP 0836993 B1

EP 0836993 B1 2001-05-16 - A method and a unit for carton-wrapping packets of cigarettes

Title (en)

A method and a unit for carton-wrapping packets of cigarettes

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Umhüllen von Zigarettenpackungen mit Kartonzuschnitten

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour envelopper des paquets de cigarettes dans des feuilles de carton

Publication

EP 0836993 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97830450 A

Priority

IT BO960521 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0836993A1] Packets (4) of cigarettes are wrapped in cartons (3) by a method that involves folding a die-cut blank (7) initially to a "U" profile around a relative group (5) of packets (4), so that three side faces are enveloped while one side face (12) and two end faces (13) remain exposed, then closing the blank around the group (5) into a tube so that the fourth side face (12) is also enveloped and at least two flaps (26, 27) continue to project from each end of the tube beyond the two end faces (13); finally, each of the flaps (26, 27) is engaged and flattened against the corresponding end face (13) by a rotary folder head (35) centred on an axis (39) perpendicular to the fold line. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 11/12; B65B 49/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/12 (2006.01); B65B 49/12 (2006.01); B65B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/004 (2013.01); B65B 11/12 (2013.01); B65B 49/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0836993 A1 19980422; EP 0836993 B1 20010516; CN 1180637 A 19980506; DE 69704829 D1 20010621; DE 69704829 T2 20011122; IT 1286263 B1 19980708; IT BO960521 A1 19980417; IT BO960521 D0 19961017

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070915

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070915

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070915

2006-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060925

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060918

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704829 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990715

1999-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-01-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980923

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-04-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI