Global Patent Index - EP 0836994 B1

EP 0836994 B1 2001-01-03 - Tension clamp for straps, particularly for bundle ties

Title (en)

Tension clamp for straps, particularly for bundle ties

Title (de)

Zugklemme für Bänder, insbesondere für Spannbänder

Title (fr)

Pince de traction pour lanière, en particulier pour collier de serrage

Publication

EP 0836994 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97402450 A

Priority

FR 9612750 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0836994A1] The strap pulling tongs comprise two handles (15,16) which pivot against a return spring (20). The central handle (15) has an opening (23) for the passage of the strap (11) and for stopping it. The traction handle (16) has a grip (32) for the strap. On one of the handles is a pivoting hole (50) by which the handle is rotated with a pivot (52) fixed to the other handle. The pivot hole is open on the side by a slot (53) of width equal to the diameter (D) of the pivot.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0836994 A1 19980422; EP 0836994 B1 20010103; DE 69703825 D1 20010208; DE 69703825 T2 20010426; DE 836994 T1 19980924; FR 2754752 A1 19980424; FR 2754752 B1 19981224

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101016

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69703825

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101016

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101016

2011-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND FRANCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND SNC

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20101031

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091016

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703825

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-08

2001-02-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000530

1999-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE GB IT

1999-01-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT

1998-09-24 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

1998-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980514

1998-06-17 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT