Global Patent Index - EP 0837206 A3

EP 0837206 A3 2000-03-15 - Door hinge for swingingly supporting a door leaf from a door frame

Title (en)

Door hinge for swingingly supporting a door leaf from a door frame

Title (de)

Türscharnier zur schwenkbaren Lagerung eines Türflügels an einem Türrahmen

Title (fr)

Charnière de porte pour le support pivotant d'un vantail de porte sur un cadre de porte

Publication

EP 0837206 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97115657 A

Priority

DE 19642637 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0837206A2] The hinge has an accommodating bearing part (2) for the frame side, with a frame link (3). A panel side hinge (4) is also provided, having a panel side link (5). The frame link has an eccentric section (6), which is arranged eccentrically in relation to the panel side link. The frame link may be formed as a pivot pin and the panel side link may be formed as a link socket. The eccentric section of the pivot pin may have a flattened circular periphery. The eccentrically formed accommodation aperture in the link socket for the eccentric section of the pivot pin has a flattened circular periphery. A spring (10) with an engagement section is linked to the eccentric section of the pivot pin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/00; E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/00 (2006.01); E05D 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0054 (2013.01); E05D 5/10 (2013.01); E05D 2005/106 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0837206 A2 19980422; EP 0837206 A3 20000315; EP 0837206 B1 20020403; DE 19642637 A1 19980716; DE 19642637 C2 20011206

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150910

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150910

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150910

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-07-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001107

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: GB IT

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05D 7/00 A, 7E 05D 7/04 B

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): GB IT

1998-04-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI