Global Patent Index - EP 0837238 B1

EP 0837238 B1 2003-06-04 - Mouldable acoustic devices

Title (en)

Mouldable acoustic devices

Title (de)

Akustisches Gerät aus spritzgiessfähigem Kunststoff

Title (fr)

Dispositifs acoustiques moulables

Publication

EP 0837238 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97304416 A

Priority

  • BR 9602968 A
  • BR 9603046 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0837238A2] Mouldable acoustic devices internally coupled to a vehicle engine's air filter relates to a mouldable acoustic box (5), comprised of a plate of porous acoustic absorbing material or a set of plates of porous acoustic materials, superimposed and glued to each other, having its shape predetermined pursuant to the internal and acoustic characteristics of the conventional air filter to which it will be internally coupled, the device (5) being essentially an acoustic internal lining having the purpose of absorbing acoustic waves generated by inlet noises, that is coupled inside the air filter's upper compartment (1) and/or lower compartment (2), the device (5) being optionally removable f vrom the relevant compartments.e

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/14 (2013.01); F02M 35/1216 (2013.01); F02M 35/1288 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0837238 A2 19980422; EP 0837238 A3 19981028; EP 0837238 B1 20030604; DE 69722555 D1 20030710; DE 69722555 T2 20040429; ES 2201247 T3 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170623

2017-07-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170623

2017-06-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69722555

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160505

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160510

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160505

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160509

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160509

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-08-31 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 20120605

2012-06-29 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

- Effective date: 20120529

2012-06-01 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Effective date: 20120502

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070624

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WESTAFLEX TUBOS FLEXIVEIS LTDA.

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201247 T3

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722555 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010924

1999-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990428

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

1998-04-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI