Global Patent Index - EP 0837241 B1

EP 0837241 B1 2001-02-28 - Axial piston pump with adjustable control plate

Title (en)

Axial piston pump with adjustable control plate

Title (de)

Axialkolbenmaschine mit variabler Fixierung der Steuerscheibe

Title (fr)

Machine à piston axial comportant un disque de commande ajustable

Publication

EP 0837241 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117281 A

Priority

DE 19643389 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19643389C1] The plungers work in a drum (6) rotating about its axis, while a connection plate (26) contains low and high pressure ports (60,61). Other ports in a control plate (25) connect the piston bores in the cylinder cyclically with the low and high pressure ones. One or more locking pins (43), accessible from the side of the connection plate furthest from the control plate, determine the relative angular positions of the two plates. There can be two or more recesses in each plate, the angular interval between those in the connection plate being different from that between those in the control plate. The recesses can be formed by round bores (49,50) or part-circular recesses. When two of these are aligned they determine one particular angular position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/2042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19643389 C1 19980102; EP 0837241 A2 19980422; EP 0837241 A3 19980722; EP 0837241 B1 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081007

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081006

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081006

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081006

2009-06-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071012

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071026

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703045 20010405

2001-03-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000802

1999-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

1999-04-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980813

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-04-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI