Global Patent Index - EP 0837286 A3

EP 0837286 A3 2000-07-05 - Gas turbine combustor chamber of annular dome section

Title (en)

Gas turbine combustor chamber of annular dome section

Title (de)

Brennkammer einer Gasturbine mit einem ringförmigen Kopfabschnitt

Title (fr)

Chambre de combustion de turbine à gaz avec section de dôme annulaire

Publication

EP 0837286 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97114340 A

Priority

DE 19643028 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0837286A2] The combustion chamber has an annular head section (1), inside which is a front plate (2) for a number of burners, which are supplied with a primary air stream by a ring of air entry apertures (10) in the head sector. The front plate carries heat shields (6) in the combustion chamber, which are fixed by screws (11). There are assembly apertures in the head section for the screws. These apertures are arranged within the outer edge of the ring of air entry apertures. There may be a ring of stagnation points on the outside of the head sector, outside the air entry apertures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/28; F23R 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/00 (2006.01); F23R 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/10 (2013.01); F23R 3/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0837286 A2 19980422; EP 0837286 A3 20000705; EP 0837286 B1 20021002; CA 2218520 A1 19980418; CA 2218520 C 20070313; DE 19643028 A1 19980423; US 5934066 A 19990810

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100820

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708367

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100820

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090817

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708367 20021107

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020503

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-04-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI