Global Patent Index - EP 0837289 A3

EP 0837289 A3 2000-04-05 - Air conditioner and method of controlling the air conditioner

Title (en)

Air conditioner and method of controlling the air conditioner

Title (de)

Klimageräte und Steuerverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conditionnement d'air et sa méthode de commande

Publication

EP 0837289 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97305776 A

Priority

JP 27461596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0837289A2] Air conditioner (1) has a function capable of automatically restarting a predetermined air conditioning operation in a case where a power supply from a power source (21) to the air conditioner (1) is interrupted and then the power supply from the power source (21) thereto is recovered. Whether or not the automatically restart operation is performed is switchably set by an auto-re-start setting means. A refrigerant is reversibly circulated by a refrigerating cycle elements annularly connected with each other of an executing means whereby an air conditioning operation is executed. A content of the air conditioning operation is memorized by a memory means as an operation content data. Whether or not the interruption of the power supply and the recovery thereof occur during the air conditioning operation is judged by a judgment means. Only in a case where the performance of the automatically restart operation is set by the auto-re-start setting means and where the interruption of the power supply and the recovery thereof occur during the air conditioning operation by the judgment of the judgment means, the operation content data is read out by a control means from the memory means and the control means makes the executing means restart automatically an air conditioning operation according to the readout operation content data.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/02 (2006.01); F24F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 11 26 December 1995 (1995-12-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 070 (P - 185) 23 March 1983 (1983-03-23)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0837289 A2 19980422; EP 0837289 A3 20000405; EP 0837289 B1 20040407; CN 1109857 C 20030528; CN 1180816 A 19980506; EP 1314934 A2 20030528; EP 1314934 A3 20060816; EP 1314934 B1 20130717; EP 1314934 B8 20130911; EP 1314935 A2 20030528; EP 1314935 A3 20060816; EP 1314935 B1 20130710; EP 1314935 B8 20130911; ES 2219735 T3 20041201; ES 2431546 T3 20131126; JP H10122635 A 19980515; KR 100249424 B1 20000401; TW 414309 U 20001201

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2014-09-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140908

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100731

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219735 T3

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2004-04-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AIR CONDITIONER

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-01-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970820

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

1998-04-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI