Global Patent Index - EP 0837294 A3

EP 0837294 A3 2001-12-05 - Refrigeration system and method for monitoring a refrigeration system

Title (en)

Refrigeration system and method for monitoring a refrigeration system

Title (de)

Kühleinrichtung und Verfahren zur Überwachung einer Kühleinrichtung

Title (fr)

Système frigorifique et procédé pour surveiller un système frigorifique

Publication

EP 0837294 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97117710 A

Priority

DE 19642745 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0837294A2] The refrigerator has a sealable cooling chamber and a cooling circuit, which is formed by an absorption circuit. This circuit includes an absorber (12), an ejection unit, a condenser (5) and an evaporator (9). A control unit is provided for the refrigerator, which has a monitoring unit for determining any cases of interference. The monitoring unit has at least one thermometer probe (19) which can be positioned at the evaporator. A thermometer probe is provided for determining the ambient temperature and a thermometer probe for determining the temperature in the cooling chamber. The monitoring system includes a sensor, which transmits a signal, if a door closing the cooling chamber is left open.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 49/04; F25B 15/10; F25D 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 49/04 (2006.01); F25B 15/10 (2006.01); F25B 49/00 (2006.01); F25B 49/02 (2006.01); F25D 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 15/10 (2013.01); F25B 49/005 (2013.01); F25B 2700/2104 (2013.01); F25B 2700/2106 (2013.01); F25B 2700/2117 (2013.01); F25D 29/008 (2013.01); F25D 2700/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0837294 A2 19980422; EP 0837294 A3 20011205; EP 0837294 B1 20060405; DE 19642745 A1 19980430; DE 19642745 C2 20000914; DE 59712611 D1 20060518; ES 2117611 T1 19980816; ES 2117611 T3 20061016; JP H10122712 A 19980515

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171014

2018-01-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180126

2017-10-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59712611

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160803

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160812

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160801

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161003

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-03 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121013

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121013

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070108

2006-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2117611 T3

2006-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060711

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712611 P 20060518

2006-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-04-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DOMETIC GMBH

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020213

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-10-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1998-08-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2117611 T1

1998-07-10 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1998-07-01 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1998-06-02 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: PROPRIA PROTEZIONE PROPRIETA' IND.

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI