Global Patent Index - EP 0837450 B1

EP 0837450 B1 2001-03-28 - Ligature for the mouthpiece of a wind instrument with a reed

Title (en)

Ligature for the mouthpiece of a wind instrument with a reed

Title (de)

Ringklemme für Mundstück eines Blasinstrumentes mit einem Zungenblatt

Title (fr)

Ligature pour bec d'un instrument à vent à anche

Publication

EP 0837450 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97402231 A

Priority

FR 9612615 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0837450A1] A reed retainer, especially for a clarinet, consists of two split rings (1, 2) of a supple material, such as a metal, alloy or plastic, which pass round the mouthpiece of the instrument and are held in place by fastening screws. The split rings are connected by lengthwise strips (5) running parallel to the axis of the instrument's mouthpiece, and the retainer also has two fixed lengthwise rods (11) which are situated between the strips (5) and hold the reed in place. The two rods can be joined together at their ends by cross-pieces to make a separate assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10D 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10D 7/06 (2006.01); G10D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10D 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0837450 A1 19980422; EP 0837450 B1 20010328; AT 200159 T 20010415; DE 69704409 D1 20010503; DE 69704409 T2 20010705; ES 2155973 T3 20010601; FR 2754624 A1 19980417; FR 2754624 B1 19981231; JP H10124043 A 19980515; US 5973245 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090926

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090925

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090925

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090925

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090925

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ETS *VANDOREN

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081001

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: VARLEPIC PARTICIPATIONS

2004-08-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: VARLEPIC PARTICIPATIONS

- Free text: ETABLISSEMENTS VANDOREN SOCIETE ANONYME DITE:#56 RUE LEPIC#F-75018 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- VARLEPIC PARTICIPATIONS#56, RUE LEPIC#75018 PARIS (FR)

2004-08-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155973 T3

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704409 20010503

2001-04-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200159 T 20010415

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000203

1999-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

1999-01-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980602

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

1998-04-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI