Global Patent Index - EP 0837487 B1

EP 0837487 B1 2002-11-13 - Focusing electrode in electron gun for color cathode ray tube

Title (en)

Focusing electrode in electron gun for color cathode ray tube

Title (de)

Fokussierelektrode in einer Elektronenkanone für eine Farbkathodenstrahlröhre

Title (fr)

Electrode de focalisation dans un canon à électrons pour un tube à rayons cathodiques couleur

Publication

EP 0837487 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97302287 A

Priority

KR 19960047103 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0837487A2] Focusing electrode in an electron gun for a color cathode ray tube, which can provides a higher freedom in an electron gun design and reduce an error occurred during assembly of the electron gun, the focusing electrode including a first focusing electrode (1) for being applied of a constant voltage, the first focusing electrode having vertically elongated electron beam pass-through holes (3C,3S) formed therein, and a second focusing electrode (2) for being applied of a dynamic voltage, the second focusing electrode having electron beam pass-through holes (4C,4S) each with a pair of burring parts (7C,7S) formed on upper and lower edges thereof for being disposed in each of the vertically elongated electron beam pass-through holes in the first focusing electrode, whereby the pair of burring parts can be disposed in each of the vertically elongated electron beam pass-through holes in the first focusing electrode without change of a horizontal diameter of the electron beam pass-through holes in the first focusing electrode.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 29/62; H01J 29/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/50 (2006.01); H01J 29/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/503 (2013.01); H01J 29/628 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0837487 A2 19980422; EP 0837487 A3 19980527; EP 0837487 B1 20021113; CN 1082714 C 20020410; CN 1180920 A 19980506; ID 18614 A 19980423; US 5869925 A 19990209

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090403

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090403

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080409

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-04-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030408

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001025

1999-02-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB

1999-02-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): FR GB

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): FR GB

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970417

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB