Global Patent Index - EP 0837526 B1

EP 0837526 B1 2001-01-03 - Automatic connnection terminal and an electrical device fitted with such a terminal

Title (en)

Automatic connnection terminal and an electrical device fitted with such a terminal

Title (de)

Automatische Anschlussklemme und ein elektrisches Gerät ausgerüstet mit einer solchen Klemme

Title (fr)

Borne de connexion automatique, et appareil électrique équipé d'une telle borne de connexion

Publication

EP 0837526 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97402410 A

Priority

FR 9612634 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0837526A1] The automatic connection method has a central slot area for a wire connection. Above the slot is a trigger shaped mechanism (34) with a heel (A3), which actions the movement of a knee shaped section (39). The knee shaped section is attached to a metallic piece (32) which protrudes in the slot section, making the electrical connection, and an end blanking section (38). Both sections are moved by the trigger shaped mechanism.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4836 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0837526 A1 19980422; EP 0837526 B1 20010103; AU 4099097 A 19980423; AU 722382 B2 20000803; DE 69703829 D1 20010208; DE 69703829 T2 20010719; ES 2153170 T3 20010216; FR 2754640 A1 19980417; FR 2754640 B1 19981218

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111014

2013-06-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130605

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111013

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101030

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-06-25 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LEGRAND SNC

- Free text: LEGRAND#128 AVENUE DU MARECHAL DE LATTRE DE TASSIGNY#F-87000 LIMOGES (FR) $ LEGRAND SNC#128, AVENUE DU MARECHAL DE LATTRE DE TASSIGNY#F-87000 LIMOGES (FR) -TRANSFER TO- LEGRAND SNC#128, AVENUE DU MARECHAL DE LATTRE DE TASSIGNY#F-87000 LIMOGES (FR) $ LEGRAND FRANCE#128, AVENUE DU MARECHAL DE LATTRE-DE-TASSIGNY#87000 LIMOGES (FR)

2006-10-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061009

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153170 T3

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703829 20010208

2001-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000511

1999-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES IT LI

1999-01-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

1998-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980529

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI