Global Patent Index - EP 0837695 A4

EP 0837695 A4 2001-03-21 - ACTINOMYCES PYOGENES AND ACTINOMYCES PYOGENES/FUSOBACTERIUM NECROPHORUM VACCINES FOR IMMUNIZING CATTLE AND SHEEP

Title (en)

ACTINOMYCES PYOGENES AND ACTINOMYCES PYOGENES/FUSOBACTERIUM NECROPHORUM VACCINES FOR IMMUNIZING CATTLE AND SHEEP

Title (de)

ACTINOMYCES PYOGENES UND ACTINOMYCES PYOGENES/FUSOBAKTERIUM NECROPHORUM IMPFSTOFFE ZUR IMMUNISIERUNG VON VIEH UND SCHAFEN

Title (fr)

VACCINS D'ACTINOMYCES PYOGENES ET D'ACTINOMYCES PYOGENES/FUSOBACTERIUM NECROPHORUM UTILES POUR IMMUNISER LE BETAIL BOVIN ET OVIN

Publication

EP 0837695 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96921496 A

Priority

  • US 9609972 W
  • US 47761995 A
  • US 48338295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9640237A1] Novel inocula for administration to ruminant animals such as cattle or sheep are provided in order to immunize the animals and lessen the incidence of liver abscesses and/or foot rot therein. In one aspect, the invention pertains to an A. pyogenes-derived vaccine including an inactivated cell culture product (e.g., cell-elaborated supernatant) from A. pyogenes cell culture in a suitable carrier. In another aspect, the invention relates to a multivalent vaccine including at least first and second bacterial components in a carrier; the first component comprises an inactivated cell culture product of A. pyogenes whereas the second component comprises an inactivated cell culture product of F. necrophorum. The inocula of the present invention finds particular utility in incidences where ruminant animals are particularly subject to A. pyogenes infection leading to liver abscesses and/or foot rot, e.g., where the animals are regularly treated with an antibiotic or where cattle are fed a high grain content concentrate diet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/02; A61K 39/05; C12N 1/00; C12N 1/02; C12N 1/14; C12N 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 1/02 (2006.01); A61K 31/195 (2006.01); A61K 31/65 (2006.01); A61K 35/74 (2006.01); A61K 39/02 (2006.01); A61K 39/05 (2006.01); A61K 39/114 (2006.01); A61K 39/116 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C12N 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/02 (2013.01); A61K 39/05 (2013.01); A61K 39/114 (2013.01); A61K 2039/521 (2013.01); A61K 2039/552 (2013.01); A61K 2039/70 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 39/02 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 39/05 + A61K 2300/00
  3. A61K 39/114 + A61K 2300/00
  4. A61K 39/116 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9640237A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9640237 A1 19961219; AR 003432 A1 19980805; AT 506074 T 20110515; AU 6270996 A 19961230; AU 713257 B2 19991125; BR 9610775 A 19990713; CA 2223754 A1 19961219; CA 2223754 C 20110222; DE 69638358 D1 20110601; EP 0837695 A1 19980429; EP 0837695 A4 20010321; EP 1535626 A2 20050601; EP 1535626 A3 20050608; EP 1535626 B1 20110420; JP H11507377 A 19990629; MX 9709785 A 19981031

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040721

2001-03-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 39/02 A, 7A 61K 39/05 B, 7C 12N 1/00 B, 7C 12N 1/14 B, 7C 12N 1/02 B, 7C 12N 1/20 B

1998-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971224

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE