Global patent index - EP 0837977 B1

EP 0837977 B1 2000-03-29 - SAFETY DEVICE FOR STABILISING A LADDER BY FASTENING AN INTERMEDIATE PORTION THEREOF TO THE TUBULAR OR RECTANGULAR MEMBERS OF A SCAFFOLDING OR RAILING AT ANY ANGLE

Title (en)

SAFETY DEVICE FOR STABILISING A LADDER BY FASTENING AN INTERMEDIATE PORTION THEREOF TO THE TUBULAR OR RECTANGULAR MEMBERS OF A SCAFFOLDING OR RAILING AT ANY ANGLE

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSVORRICTUNG ZUM SICHERN VON LEITERN AN ROHRFÖRMIGEN STRUKTUREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE ASSURANT LA STABILITE DES ECHELLES PAR FIXATION INTERMEDIAIRE DE L'ECHELLE AUX STRUCTURES TUBULAIRES OU RECTANGULAIRES D'ECHAFAUDAGES OU GARDE-CORPS QUELLE QUE SOIT LEUR INCLINAISON

Publication

EP 0837977 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95925877 A

Priority

FR 9500937 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9703273A1] A device for preventing ladder accidents by fastening a ladder to tubular or rectangular members at any angle. The device consists of a ladder-engaging portion (1) within which the ladder upright may be locked by manually tightening a thumbscrew (2) extending through a cylindrical tube (6) secured to a clamp (3) that is fitted around a tubular or rectangular member (10) by means of a screw (4) on which a thumbnut (7) is tightened. The device is particularly suitable for use by building and construction workers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06C 7/48; E04G 7/16; E06C 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/16 (2006.01); E06C 1/34 (2006.01); E06C 7/48 (2006.01); E06C 7/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06C 7/50 (2013.01); E04G 7/16 (2013.01); E06C 1/34 (2013.01); E06C 7/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB GR IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9703273 A1 19970130; DE 69516023 D1 20000504; EP 0837977 A1 19980429; EP 0837977 B1 20000329

INPADOC legal status

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ANTUNES EDUARDO

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-09-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69516023

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-04

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB GR IT NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

1998-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980528

1998-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980209

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB GR IT NL PT SE