Global Patent Index - EP 0837984 B1

EP 0837984 B1 2000-06-07 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ASSURER LA COMMANDE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0837984 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97915336 A

Priority

  • DE 9700420 W
  • DE 19618893 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19618893A1] The invention concerns a method and device for controlling a motor vehicle internal combustion engine, according to which a desired torque value is predetermined and divided into at least two desired values, which are used to adjust the filling of the internal combustion engine, and at least one further performance parameter which brings about a rapid variation in torque, the at least two desired values having different values in at least one operating state.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/10; F02D 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 5/15 (2006.01); F02D 37/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/16 (2006.01); F02D 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1497 (2013.01); F02D 37/02 (2013.01); F02D 41/10 (2013.01); F02D 43/00 (2013.01); F02D 2250/18 (2013.01); F02D 2250/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19618893 A1 19971113; EP 0837984 A1 19980429; EP 0837984 B1 20000607; JP 3995718 B2 20071024; JP H11509910 A 19990831; KR 100406809 B1 20040218; US 6000376 A 19991214; WO 9743531 A1 19971120

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59701836

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-03-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050306

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-03-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040307

2003-03-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030324

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701836 20000713

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990915

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980520

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE